Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Reid Rafla, Heather Jeanette (CPSO#: 56961)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jul 1987

Summary

Former Name: Rafla, Heather Jeanette Reid (used until: 29 Jun 1987 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 102
21 Surrey Street West
Guelph ON  N1H 3R3
Phone: (519) 837-3623
Fax: (519) 837-5425
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: H. Reid Rafla Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 05 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Reid Rafla ( CPSO# 56961 )

Business Address:
102 - 21 Surrey Street West
Guelph ON  N1H 3R3
Phone Number: (519) 837-3623

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1988 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HEATHER JEANETTE REID RAFLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REID RAFLA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1987