Reid, Robert Leslie (CPSO#: 28139)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 May 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 May 1981

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
OBS/GYN Victory 4
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 542-9473
Fax: (613) 533-6779
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert Leslie Reid Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 07 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Reid ( CPSO# 28139 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
OBS/GYN Victory 4
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 542-9473

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 16 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT LESLIE REID may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REID is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 May 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Feb 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jun 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 May 1981