Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Reis, Marciano Dias De Oliveira (CPSO#: 51964)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Nov 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Aug 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese, Spanish

Education:Universidade Federal Do Parana, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Clinical Pathology
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4066
Fax: (416) 480-6035
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Department of Clinical Pathology
Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Canada
Phone: (416) 323-6292
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Dept of Laboratory Hematology
University Health Network
E11-415
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Canada
Phone: (416) 340-4979
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Marciano Reis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 20 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Reis ( CPSO# 51964 )

Business Address:
Department of Clinical Pathology
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Room B204
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4066

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Hematological Pathology Effective: 16 Dec 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARCIANO DIAS DE OLIVEIRA REIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REIS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Nov 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 1992