Reisman, John Joseph (CPSO#: 51489)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 May 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of
Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 2637
Fax: (613) 738-4297
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John Joseph Reisman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 24 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Reisman ( CPSO# 51489 )

Business Address:
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 18 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 16 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN JOSEPH REISMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REISMAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 May 1984