Remillard, Timothy Gordon (CPSO#: 62578)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 May 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jul 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Box 70
78 King St E
Thornbury ON  N0H 2P0
Phone: (519) 599-2753
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: T. G. Remillard Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 22 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Remillard ( CPSO# 62578 )

Business Address:
78 King Street East
Box 70
Thornbury ON  N0H 2P0
Phone Number: (519) 599-2732

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TIMOTHY GORDON REMILLARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REMILLARD is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 1991
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Feb 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 27 Feb 2017
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 27 Feb 2017
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 27 May 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2017

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 27 Feb 2017
Summary:

On February 27, 2017, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Timothy Gordon Remillard 
committed an act of professional misconduct in that he has engaged in conduct or an act or acts 
relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would 
reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. 
 
At all material times, Dr. Remillard practised family medicine in a family health group (the 
“Group”) in a clinic in Thornbury, Ontario. The Group was composed of a number of physicians, 
including Dr. Remillard and Dr. X. The Group shared an electronic medical records system 
(“EMR”). The medical records of all patients of the Group were maintained in the EMR. 
 
In the period preceding the events at issue in this hearing, the relationship between Dr. Remillard 
and Dr. X had become acrimonious, with each physician accusing the other of various types of 
misbehaviour. In the context of the deteriorating relationship between the two physicians, Dr. 
Remillard engaged in the following acts in 2014: 
 
In transferring patient charts from the Group EMR to Dr. X, for patients who were orphaned or 
had been patients of Dr. Remillard or other physicians in the Group, but were now patients of Dr. 
X, Dr. Remillard deleted his entries from the patients’ electronic charts, including family 
histories, diagnoses, diagnostic results, letters, forms and documents. The record deletion was 
not in accordance with proper document retention practices and policies.  

After the deletions were discovered and brought to his attention, Dr. Remillard indicates that he 
restored the information to the EMR that he had previously deleted. 

The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that: 
-  The Registrar suspend Dr. Remillard’s Certificate of Registration for a three (3) month 
   period, effective immediately. 
-  The Registrar impose the following term, condition and limitation on Dr.  Remillard’s 
   certificate of registration: 
      o  At his own expense, Dr. Remillard shall participate in and successfully complete, 
         within six (6) months of the date of this Order, individualized instruction in medical 
         ethics satisfactory to the College, with an instructor selected by the College.  The 
         instructor shall provide a summative report to the College including his or her 
         conclusion about whether the instruction was completed successfully by Dr. 
         Remillard. 
-  Dr. Remillard appear before the panel to be reprimanded. 
-  Dr. Remillard pay costs to the College for a one day hearing in the amount of $5,000.00 
   within 30 days of the date of this Order. 

At the conclusion of the hearing, the Committee administered the public reprimand.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): February 27, 2017

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: July 8, 2015
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

Update as of February 17, 2016: The member has completed all elements of this SCERP.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)


Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: July 8, 2015
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)