Remington, Gary James (CPSO#: 51490)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Sep 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Sep 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
250 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 1R8
Phone: (416) 535-8501 Ext. 34750
Fax: (416) 979-4292
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Gary Remington Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 22 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Remington ( CPSO# 51490 )

Business Address:
250 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 535-8501

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre of Addiction & Mental Health,- College Street Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 28 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GARY JAMES REMINGTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REMINGTON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1980 to 14 Jun 1981
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 10 Sep 1984 to 31 Dec 1984
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1980
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Dec 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 1996