Rendak, Ian (CPSO#: 61364)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Sep 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Sep 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
9600 Bathurst
Suite 302
Vaughan ON  L6A 3Z8
Phone: 6475572262
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ian Rendak Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 1 2016


Corporation Name: Ian Rendak Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 13 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Rendak ( CPSO# 61364 )

Business Address:
302 - 9600 Bathurst Street
Vaughan ON  L6A 3Z8

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec
USA - Florida

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Nuclear Medicine Effective: 20 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 07 Nov 1989 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IAN RENDAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RENDAK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2004