Reynolds, Donna Louise (CPSO#: 67776)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 170
5 Fairview Mall Drive
North York ON  M2J 2Z1
Phone: (416) 447-5531
Fax: (416) 447-5691
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Magee & Reynolds Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 12 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Reynolds ( CPSO# 67776 )
Dr. C. Magee ( CPSO# 62622 )

Business Address:
170 - 5 Fairview Mall Drive
North York ON  M2J 2Z1
Phone Number: (416) 447-5531

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist
Community Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DONNA LOUISE REYNOLDS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REYNOLDS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 4 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 5 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1996