Rice, Jill Lorraine (CPSO#: 73305)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Aug 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Aug 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bruyere Continuing Care
43 Bruyere Street
Ottawa ON  K1N 5C8
Phone: (613) 562-6398
Fax: (613) 562-6394
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J. Rice Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 16 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Rice ( CPSO# 73305 )

Business Address:
Elisabeth Bruyere Hospital
Bruyere Continuing Care
43 Bruyere Street
Suite 264 J-H
Ottawa ON  K1N 5C8
Phone Number: (613) 562-6398

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bruyere Continuing Care-Elisabeth Bruyere Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JILL LORRAINE RICE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RICE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Apr 1999 to 27 Apr 1999
Elective Trainee - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 2002 to 30 Sep 2003
Clinical Fellow - Palliative Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Apr 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2001