Rice, Sarah Christie (CPSO#: 74770)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Nov 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Somerset West Community
Health Centre
30 Rosemount Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 1P4
Phone: (613) 688-1177
Fax: (613) 688-1991
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Melrose Family Health Team
210 Melrose Avenue
Ottawa
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4K7
Canada
Phone: 613-761-4334
Fax: 613-761-4200
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. Hui Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 31 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Hui ( CPSO# 69901 )
Dr. S. Rice ( CPSO# 74770 )

Business Address:
Division of Infectious Disease
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SARAH CHRISTIE RICE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RICE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 12 Jan 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Nov 2002