Ricer, Michael Wilfred (CPSO#: 57005)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 May 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Oct 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 508
95 Bayly Street
Ajax ON  L1S 7K8
Phone: (905) 427-6111
Fax: (905) 427-4482
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael Ricer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 04 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ricer ( CPSO# 57005 )

Business Address:
508 - 95 Bayly Street
Ajax ON  L1S 7K8
Phone Number: (905) 427-6111

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 11 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL WILFRED RICER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RICER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 19 May 1986 to 14 Jun 1986
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 May 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Oct 1988