Richardson, Janet Ann (CPSO#: 63843)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Sep 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Medcan Clinic
Suite 1500
150 York Street
Toronto ON  M5H 3S5
Phone: (416) 350-5900
Fax: (416) 350-5981
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Janet Ann Richardson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 03 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Richardson ( CPSO# 63843 )

Business Address:
Medican Clinic
150 York Street
Suite 1500
Toronto ON  M5H 3S5
Phone Number: (416) 350-5900

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 05 Dec 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JANET ANN RICHARDSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RICHARDSON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 1992