Richardson, Susan Elaine (CPSO#: 29524)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jun 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dept of Paedatric Laborarory Med
Room 3227 Burton Wing
Hospital For Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-5992
Fax: (416) 813-8674
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Thomas MacMillan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 30 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Richardson ( CPSO# 29524 )
Dr. T. MacMillan ( CPSO# 90690 )

Business Address:
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
E W 8- 415
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 340-3155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 21 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Microbiology Effective: 12 Dec 1985 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 02 Dec 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUSAN ELAINE RICHARDSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RICHARDSON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1986