Richman, Jack (CPSO#: 21406)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Jun 1968

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1968

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 335
5945 Airport Road
Mississauga ON  L4V 1R9
Phone: (905) 678-2924 Ext. 5533
Fax: (905) 678-2939
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

8295 Pine Cay
West Palm Beach FL  33411
United States
Phone: 561 798 7655
County: 
Electoral District: 

264 Elton Park Road
Oakville ON  L6J 4C1
Canada
Phone: (905) 849-1133
Fax: (905) 845-0247
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Vermont

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1976 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JACK RICHMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RICHMAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1968