Richter, Kenneth (CPSO#: 56927)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 May 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Nov 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1025 Pine Ave. West
Montreal QC  H3A 1A1
Phone: (514) 934-1934 Ext. 31337
Fax: (514) 934-4465
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ken Richter Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 22 2007


Corporation Name: Ken Richter Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 2 2014

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 11 Jun 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KENNETH RICHTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RICHTER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 May 1986
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Nov 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Nov 2007