Riddick, Elaine Patricia (CPSO#: 51908)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Sep 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jul 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Liverpool, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Richmond Goulborn Medical Centr
P O Box 370
6206 Perth Street
Richmond ON  K0A 2Z0
Phone: (613) 838-1223
Fax: (613) 838-2152
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: E.P. Riddick Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 26 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Riddick ( CPSO# 51908 )

Business Address:
6206 Perth Street
Richmond ON  K0A 2Z0

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 23 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Jan 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELAINE PATRICIA RIDDICK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RIDDICK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985