Rifkind, Aaron Wolfe (CPSO#: 26185)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Oct 1973

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Oct 1973

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Edinburgh, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
826 Main Street East
Hamilton ON  L8M 1L6
Phone: (905) 549-6123
Fax: (905) 548-0770
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Aaron Rifkind Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 08 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Rifkind ( CPSO# 26185 )

Business Address:
826 Main Street East
Hamilton ON  L8M 1L6
Phone Number: (905) 549-6123

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 05 Apr 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AARON WOLFE RIFKIND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RIFKIND is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 22 May 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Oct 1973