Riley, Sheryl Ann (CPSO#: 72200)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Box 520
299 Main Street North
Callander ON  P0H 1H0
Phone: (705) 752-1004
Electoral District: 08
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

50 College Dr
North Bay Regional Hospital
North Bay ON  P1B 0A4
Canada
Phone: (705) 474-8600
County: Territorial District of Nipissing
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Riley Truong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 16 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Truong ( CPSO# 72575 )
Dr. S. Riley ( CPSO# 72200 )

Business Address:
Callander Lakeside Medical Clinic
299 Main Street North
Box 520
Callander ON  P0H 1H0
Phone Number: (705) 752-1004

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHERYL ANN RILEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RILEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2000