Rinne, Claus Herman (CPSO#: 51733)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Aug 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 206
430 The Boardwalk
Waterloo ON  N2T 0C1
Phone: (519) 741-8660
Fax: (519) 741-5772
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. Rinne Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 28 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Rinne ( CPSO# 51733 )

Business Address:
Suite 206
430 The Boardwalk
Waterloo ON  N2T 0C1
Phone Number: (519) 741-8660

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1985 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 01 Dec 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CLAUS HERMAN RINNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RINNE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 1987