Ripley, Carl Douglas (CPSO#: 51734)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Royal Ottawa Mental Health Centre
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7K4
Phone: (613) 722-6521 Ext. 7050
Fax: (613) 798-2988
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Carl Ripley Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 16 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Ripley ( CPSO# 51734 )

Business Address:
Royal Ottawa Hospital
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7K4
Phone Number: (613) 722-6521

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 07 Jun 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CARL DOUGLAS RIPLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RIPLEY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1986