Ritacca, Frank Vincent (CPSO#: 73901)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Credit Valley Professional Building
Suite 512
2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2V8
Phone: (905) 569-7600
Fax: (905) 607-3002
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 202
5359 Dundas St W
Etobicoke ON  M9B 1B1
Canada
Phone: (416) 622-3266
Fax: (416) 622-7831
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Frank Ritacca Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 02 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Ritacca ( CPSO# 73901 )

Business Address:
Credit Valley Professional Building
Suite 512
2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2V8
Phone Number: (905) 569-7600

Business Address:
202 - 5359 Dundas Street West
Toronto ON  M9B 1B1
Phone Number: (416) 622-3266

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 12 Sep 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FRANK VINCENT RITACCA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RITACCA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2003