Rival, Richard Allan (CPSO#: 61150)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Medical Arts Building
Suite 104
581 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P6
Phone: (905) 898-2444
Fax: (905) 898-5558
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Richard Rival Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 25 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Rival ( CPSO# 61150 )

Business Address:
Medical Arts Building
104 - 581 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P6
Phone Number: (905) 898-2444

Business Address:
Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 898-2444

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 08 Sep 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RICHARD ALLAN RIVAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RIVAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1990