Rivlin, Leon (CPSO#: 70156)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
89 Queensway West, Unit 312
Mississauga ON  L5B 2V2
Phone: (905) 281-9898
Fax: (905) 281-9143
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Humber River Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Canada
Phone: (416) 242-1000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Leon Rivlin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 19 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Rivlin ( CPSO# 70156 )

Business Address:
Suite 312
89 The Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2V2
Phone Number: (905) 281-9898

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LEON RIVLIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RIVLIN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1998