Rizos, John D. (CPSO#: 55794)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Aug 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Emergency Department
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-4141
Fax: (905) 813-4477
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

KMH Cardiology
2075 Hadwen Rd
Mississauga ON  L5K 2L3
Canada
Phone: 905-855-1860
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

N H L P A
1200 - 10 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5J 2R8
Canada
Phone: (416) 313-2300
Fax: (416) 313-2301
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John Rizos Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 20 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Rizos ( CPSO# 55794 )

Business Address:
KMH Cardiology
2075 Hawden Road
Mississauga ON  L5K 2L3
Phone Number: (905) 855-1860

Business Address:
Credit Valley Hospital
Emergency Department
2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-2200

Business Address:
NHLPA
1200 - 10 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5J 2N8
Phone Number: (416) 313-2300

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1987 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Oct 1990 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN D. RIZOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RIZOS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1985 to 16 Jun 1986
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 30 Jun 1986
Elective Trainee - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 1986