Robb, Marjorie Elizabeth (CPSO#: 58342)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Apr 2012

Summary

Former Names: Robb-Aquino, Marjorie Elizabeth (used until: 13 Feb 2007 )     Robb, Marjorie Elizabeth (used until: 21 Jun 1988 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Childrens Hospital of EO
Suite 200
311 McArthur Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1L 8M3
Phone: (613) 738-6990
Fax: (613) 738-4891
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Marjorie Robb Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 28 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Robb ( CPSO# 58342 )

Business Address:
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Business Address:
CHEO Outpatient Psychiatry
200 - 311 McArthur Avenue
Vanier ON  K1L 8M3
Phone Number: (613) 738-6990

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 28 May 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARJORIE ELIZABETH ROBB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROBB is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 28 Oct 1992
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Nov 1988
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Apr 2012