Roberts, Amanda Lily (CPSO#: 86365)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
Department of Surgery
501 Smyth Road
Box 202
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: 613-737-8899 Ext. 78428
Fax: 613-737-8371
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Amanda Roberts Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 27 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Roberts ( CPSO# 86365 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital - Department of Surgery
501 Smyth Road
Box 202
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8899

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMANDA LILY ROBERTS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROBERTS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 06 Oct 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Jan 2016
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013