Roberts, David Kenneth (CPSO#: 33202)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 May 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 May 1982

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
712 Davis Drive
Suite 308
Newmarket ON  L3Y 8C3
Phone: (905) 895-1090
Fax: (905) 895-2680
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Canada
Phone: (905) 895-4521 Ext. 2216
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

28 Main Street North
Newmarket ON  L3Y 3Z7
Canada
Phone: (905) 895-3487
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. D. Kenneth Roberts Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 22 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Roberts ( CPSO# 33202 )

Business Address:
712 Davis Drive
Suite 308
Newmarket ON  L3Y 8C3
Phone Number: (905) 895-1090

Business Address:
Southlake Regional Health Centre
Department of Medicine
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Business Address:
28 Main Street North
Newmarket ON  L3Y 3Z7
Phone Number: (905) 895-3487

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 22 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 19 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID KENNETH ROBERTS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROBERTS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 May 1982

Member-reported Findings of Malpractice/Professional Negligence

On October 9, 2014, at the Ontario Superior Court of Justice in Newmarket, a finding of Professional Negligence was made against Dr. David K Roberts in respect of an incident that took place in March 2009.