Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Roberts, Nasreen (CPSO#: 51759)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Aug 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jul 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Urdu

Education:Punjab University, Pakistan, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Psychiatry
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone: (613) 544-3310 Ext. 3510
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nasreen Roberts Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 08 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Roberts ( CPSO# 51759 )

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3310

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Business Address:
Children's Mental Health Services
300 - 3 Applewood Drive
Belleville ON  K3P 4E3
Phone Number: (613) 966-3100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 24 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NASREEN ROBERTS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROBERTS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 15 Sep 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2004