Robertson, Catharine Jane (CPSO#: 54524)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Catharine Jane Robertson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 12 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario 401 Smyth Rd Ottawa, ON K1H 8L1 Phone: (613) 737-7600
Date Received: 01 May 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 17 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018