Robertson, Marilyn Susan (CPSO#: 62593)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Argyle Medical Clinic
Unit 3
245 Argyle Street South
Caledonia ON  N3W 1K7
Phone: (905) 765-5245
Fax: (905) 765-1090
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Marilyn Robertson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 27 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Robertson ( CPSO# 62593 )

Business Address:
Argyle Medical Clinic
3 - 245 Argyle Street South
Caledonia ON  N3W 1K7
Phone Number: (905) 765-5245

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARILYN SUSAN ROBERTSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROBERTSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1990 to 17 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1991