Robertus, Inese (CPSO#: 82834)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Latvian

Education:Medical Academy of Latvia, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
9651 Yonge St
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 1V7
Phone: (905) 883-1033
Fax: (289) 809-3433
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Vaughan Pain Clinic
3175 Rutherford Road Unit 23
Vaughan ON  L4K 5Y6
Canada
Phone: (905) 761-1288
Fax: (905) 761-2088
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

847 Barton St E
Hamilton ON  L8L 3B4
Canada
Phone: (905) 581-5543
Fax: (905) 581-7406
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

180 Steeles Ave W
unit 7 & 8
Thornhill ON  L4J 2L1
Canada
Phone: 416-477-9861
Fax: 844-477-9861
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. INESE ROBERTUS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROBERTUS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2007