Robinson, Dale Keith (CPSO#: 55952)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Mar 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Mar 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
207-377 Church St
Markham ON  L6B 1A1
Phone: (905) 554-8711
Fax: (905) 554-8815
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dale K. Robinson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 13 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Robinson ( CPSO# 55952 )

Business Address:
207 - 377 Church Street
Markham ON  L6B 1A1
Phone Number: (905) 554-8711

Business Address:
Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone Number: (905) 472-7000

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
MS Clinic
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5377

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia
Nova Scotia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 26 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DALE KEITH ROBINSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROBINSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1985 to 14 Jun 1986
PostGrad Yr 1 - Rotating Internship

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Mar 2011