Robinson, David Clifford George (CPSO#: 63661)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Sep 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
David Braley Sport Medicine And
Rehabilitation Centre
Room DBAC WB127
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 525-9140 Ext. 23575
Fax: (905) 526-7397
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D.C.G. Robinson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 07 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Robinson ( CPSO# 63661 )

Business Address:
McMaster University
David Braley Sport Medicine and
Rehabilitation Centre DBAC WB127
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone Number: (905) 525-9140

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID CLIFFORD GEORGE ROBINSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROBINSON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 1992