Rodger, Marc Alan (CPSO#: 65977)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jun 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital
PO Box 201
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 74641
Fax: (613) 739-6102
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Canada
Phone: (613) 746-4621
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Marc Rodger Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 23 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Rodger ( CPSO# 65977 )

Business Address:
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Business Address:
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 12 Sep 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARC ALAN RODGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RODGER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 04 Nov 1996
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 05 Nov 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Sep 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Sep 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1993