Rodriguez-Marin, Emilio (CPSO#: 65758)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jul 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:McGill University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Medical Imaging
The Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-3978
Fax: (905) 813-3042
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rodriguez-Marin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 16 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Rodriguez-Marin ( CPSO# 65758 )

Business Address:
Trillium Health Centre
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8

Business Address:
Trillium Health Partners
150 Sherway Drive
Toronto ON  M9C 1A5
Phone Number: (416) 259-6671

Business Address:
Department of Medical Imaging
The Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-4491

Business Address:
16 Third Avenue
Ward's Island
Toronto ON  M5J 2B2
Phone Number: (416) 203-8570

Business Address:
Credit Valley Imaging Associates
2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Suite G02
Mississauga ON  L5M 2V8
Phone Number: (905) 828-0653

Business Address:
Milton Diagnostic Imaging
75 Main Street
Suite 15
Milton ON  L9T 2Y6
Phone Number: (905) 878-8831

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EMILIO RODRIGUEZ-MARIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RODRIGUEZ-MARIN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Dec 1997
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1997