Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Roe, Michael John (CPSO#: 62592)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Feb 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201
460 Wellington Street
St Thomas ON  N5R 6H9
Phone: (519) 637-3987
Fax: (519) 637-3980
Electoral District: 02
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St. Thomas Elgin General Hospital
189 Elm Street
St Thomas ON  N5R 5C4
Canada
Phone: (519) 631-2020
County: County of Elgin
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M.J. Roe Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 25 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Roe ( CPSO# 62592 )

Business Address:
201 - 460 Wellington Street
St Thomas ON  N5R 6H9
Phone Number: (519) 637-3987

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL JOHN ROE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1990 to 17 Jun 1991
Other - Rotating Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Feb 1992