Rofaeel, Ayman Sedki Hakim (CPSO#: 81443)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Apr 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Apr 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Mansoura University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Guelph General Hospital
Department of Anaethesia
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Phone: (519) 822-5350 Ext. 2218
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ayman Rofaeel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 31 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Rofaeel ( CPSO# 81443 )

Business Address:
Guelph General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Phone Number: (519) 822-5350

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
Homewood Health Centre Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 26 Jan 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AYMAN SEDKI HAKIM ROFAEEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROFAEEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 22 Sep 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
International Specialist Physician - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Sep 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Feb 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 05 Feb 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Apr 2011