Rogers, John Michael (CPSO#: 25312)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Oct 1972

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Oct 1972

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London X-Ray Associates
Suite 104
450 Central Avenue
London ON  N6B 2E8
Phone: (519) 672-5270
Fax: (519) 672-4459
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John Michael Rogers Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 24 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Rogers ( CPSO# 25312 )

Business Address:
450 Central Avenue
Suite 104
London ON  N6B 2E8
Phone Number: (519) 672-7900

Business Address:
Suite 104
460 Springbank Drive
London ON  N6J 1H1

Business Address:
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6100

Business Address:
440 Boler Road
London ON  N6K 4L2
Phone Number: (519) 657-8246

Business Address:
105 - 595 Bradley Avenue
London ON  N6E 3Z8
Phone Number: (519) 913-7900

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital Goderich
Chatham Public General Hospital Society Chatham
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
Four Counties Health Services,Newbury Newbury
Hanover and District Hospital Hanover
Kincardine and District Site,South Bruce Grey Health Kincardine
Listowel Memorial Hospital Listowel
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Chesley Site Chesley
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Durham-Memorial Site Durham
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Walkerton Site Walkerton
South Huron Hospital Exeter
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg
Wingham and District Hospital Wingham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 13 Jun 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN MICHAEL ROGERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROGERS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Oct 1972