Rogovein, Ted S. (CPSO#: 55312)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Oct 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6103
Fax: (416) 530-6073
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ted S. Rogovein Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 21 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Rogovein ( CPSO# 55312 )

Business Address:
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6103

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TED S. ROGOVEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROGOVEIN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 1986