Rohekar, Sherry (CPSO#: 76058)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Hospital
Room D2 105
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone: (519) 646-6242
Fax: (519) 646-6221
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sherry Rohekar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 24 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Rohekar ( CPSO# 76058 )

Business Address:
St Joseph's Hospital
268 Grosvenor Street
Room D2-105
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6242

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 04 Oct 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHERRY ROHEKAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROHEKAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jun 2006