Rohlicek, Charles V (CPSO#: 58611)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jan 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Czech, English, French

Education:McGill University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Montreal Children's Hospital
Division of Cardiology
1001 boul Décarie
Montreal QC  H3A 3J1
Phone: (514) 412-4423
Fax: (514) 412-4273
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 230
2222 boul. René Levesque
Montréal, Québec
H3H 1R6
Westmount QC  H3Z 1W1
Canada
Phone: (514) 846-0800
Fax: (514) 846-0900
County: 
Electoral District: 

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 04 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 29 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHARLES V ROHLICEK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROHLICEK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 5 - Paediatric Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jan 1989