Roitberg, Inna (CPSO#: 63614)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew, Russian

Education:The Kishinev State Medical Institute, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
7131 Bathurst Street
Suite 305
Thornhill ON  L4J 7Z1
Phone: (905) 882-6798
Fax: (905) 882-6448
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Roitberg Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 12 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Roitberg ( CPSO# 63614 )

Business Address:
Suite 305
7131 Bathurst Street
Thornhill ON  L4J 1Z7
Phone Number: (905) 882-6798

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Dec 1992 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. INNA ROITBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROITBERG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1992