Romatowski, Walter William (CPSO#: 32386)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jun 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 17 Jan 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
180 Vine Street South
Suite 308
St Catharines ON  L2R 7P3
Phone: (905) 682-8693
Fax: (905) 682-0311
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Romatowski Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 22 2016

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Gastroenterology Effective: 01 Jan 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 17 Jan 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 17 Jan 2018 Active View Details [+]
            As from January 17, 2018, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Walter William
            Romatowski in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr.
            Romatowski to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                               UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                            ("Undertaking")
                                                  of
                                     DR. WALTER WILLIAM ROMATOWSKI
                                          ("Dr. Romatowski")
                                                  to 
                             COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                            (the "College")



            A     .PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "Discipline Committee" means the Discipline Committee of the College;
                  
                  "ERCP" means Endoscopic Retrograde Cholangiopancreatography;
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
                  System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Romatowski, certificate of registration number 32386, am a member
                  of the College. 

            (3)   I, Dr. Romatowski, acknowledge that the College initiated an
                  investigation bearing File Number 7215253 (the "Investigation") into
                  whether I engaged in professional misconduct and/or am incompetent in my
                  gastroenterology practice, including my management of patients undergoing
                  ERCP.

            (4)   I, Dr. Romatowski, acknowledge that, if an original copy of this
                  Undertaking as signed by me is accepted by the Inquiries, Complaints and
                  Reports Committee, the College will also deliver a caution in person.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (5)   I, Dr. Romatowski, undertake to abide by the provisions of this
                  Undertaking, effective upon the date this Undertaking is approved by the
                  ICR Committee ("Effective Date").

            (6)   Practice Restriction

                  (a)   I, Dr. Romatowski, undertake that I will not perform any procedures
                        in which a patient is sedated to a Ramsey Sedation Scale (RSS) of
                        4-6 and/or administered Propofol unless an Anesthesiologist is
                        present.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Romatowski, undertake that, during all other procedures
                        where my patient is sedated, I will have a qualified regulated
                        health professional present in the room whose primary
                        responsibility it is to monitor the patient's airway.
                  
            (7)   Clinical Supervision 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Romatowski, undertake to practise under the guidance of a
                        clinical supervisor(s) acceptable to the College (the "Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)"), for a minimum of six (6) months, on the terms set
                        out below ("Clinical Supervision"). 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Romatowski, undertake to have an initial meeting with the
                        Clinical Supervisor to discuss the Clinical Supervisor's practice
                        improvement recommendations.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Romatowski, acknowledge and undertake that each phase of
                        Clinical Supervision set out below will only be reduced upon
                        recommendation of the Clinical Supervisor(s) and approval by the
                        College.
                  
                  (d)   Phase 1 of Clinical Supervision ("Phase 1")
                  
                        (i)   I, Dr. Romatowski, undertake to engage in Phase 1 for a
                              minimum of two (2) months on the terms set out below.
                  
                        (ii)  During Phase 1, I, Dr. Romatowski, undertake to meet with my
                              Clinical Supervisor(s) at least once every week, to discuss
                              the Clinical Supervisor(s)'s review of a minimum of
                              twenty-five (25) of my patient charts, which will include all
                              my ERCP cases;
                  
                        (iii) During Phase 1, I, Dr. Romatowski, undertake to ensure that
                              my Clinical Supervisor(s) directly observes me performing a
                              variety of gastroenterological procedures, at least once per
                              week, with a minimum of 3 consecutive procedures observed at
                              one time, including ERCP, colonoscopy and gastroscopy;
                  
                        (iv)  I, Dr. Romatowski, acknowledge that during Phase 1, the
                              Clinical Supervisor(s) will provide a report to the College
                              at least once every month.
                  
                        (v)   I, Dr. Romatowski, acknowledge that after a minimum of two
                              (2) months of Phase 1, if the Clinical Supervisor(s) is
                              satisfied that I have the necessary knowledge, skills and
                              judgment to practice in a less supervised environment, the
                              Clinical Supervisor(s) may recommend to the College that
                              supervision be reduced.
                  
                  (e)   Phase 2 of Clinical Supervision ("Phase 2")
                  
                        (i)   Upon the recommendation of the Clinical Supervisor(s) and
                              approval by the College, I, Dr. Romatowski, undertake to
                              engage in Phase 2 for a minimum of two (2) months on the
                              terms set out below.
                  
                        (ii)  During Phase 2, I, Dr. Romatowski, undertake to meet with my
                              Clinical Supervisor(s) at least once every two (2) weeks, to
                              discuss the Clinical Supervisor(s)'s review of a minimum of
                              twenty-five (25) of my patient charts, thirteen (13) of which
                              will include ERCP;
                  
                        (iii) I, Dr. Romatowski, acknowledge that during Phase 2, the
                              Clinical Supervisor(s) will provide a report to the College
                              at least once every two (2) months.
                  
                        (iv)  I, Dr. Romatowski, acknowledge that after a minimum of two
                              (2) months of Phase 2, if the Clinical Supervisor(s) is
                              satisfied that I have the necessary knowledge, skills and
                              judgment to practice in a less supervised environment, the
                              Clinical Supervisor(s) may recommend to the College that
                              supervision be reduced.
                  
                  (f)   Phase 3 of Clinical Supervision ("Phase 3")
                  
                        (i)   Upon the recommendation of the Clinical Supervisor(s) and
                              approval by the College, I, Dr. Romatowski, undertake to
                              engage in Phase 3 for a minimum of two (2) months on the
                              terms set out below.
                  
                        (ii)  During Phase 3, I, Dr. Romatowski, undertake to meet with my
                              Clinical Supervisor(s) at least once every month, to discuss
                              the Clinical Supervisor(s)'s review of a minimum of
                              twenty-five (25) of my patient charts, thirteen (13) of which
                              will include ERCP;
                  
                  
                        (iii) I, Dr. Romatowski, acknowledge that during Phase 3, the
                              Clinical Supervisor(s) will provide a report to the College
                              at least once every two (2) months.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Romatowski, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)'s undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor(s). In
                        addition to what is set out above, the Clinical Supervisor(s) will,
                        at minimum: 
                  
                        (i)   Facilitate the education program set out in the
                              Individualized Education Plan ("IEP"), attached hereto as
                              Appendix "B";
                  
                        (ii)  Discuss with me any concerns arising from the chart reviews
                              or observations;
                  
                        (iii) Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development and inquire into my
                              compliance with the recommendations; and
                  
                        (iv)  Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor(s) deem necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision.
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. Romatowski, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be
                        selected by the Clinical Supervisor(s) based on the educational
                        needs identified in the IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "B", as
                        well as the areas of concern identified in the reports of the
                        medical inspector dated February 1, 2017 and March 8, 2017, and
                        concerns that may arise during the period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
                        (i)   I, Dr. Romatowski, undertake to cooperate fully with the
                              Clinical Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term
                              of this Undertaking and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, and
                              to abide by the recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor(s),
                              including but not limited to, any recommended practice
                              improvements and ongoing professional development.
                  
                  (j)   I, Dr. Romatowski, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking is signed and delivered to the College within thirty
                        (30) days of the Effective Date.
                  
                  (k)   I, Dr. Romatowski, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  (l)   I, Dr. Romatowski, undertake that if I am unable to obtain a
                        Clinical Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (7)(j)
                        and/or (k) above, I will cease practising medicine until such time
                        as I have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  
                  
                  (m)   I, Dr. Romatowski, acknowledge that if I am required to cease
                        practise as a result of section (7)(l) above this will constitute a
                        term, condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and
                        that term, condition or limitation will be included on the public
                        register.
                  
            (8)   Professional Education  

                  (a)   I, Dr. Romatowski, undertake to participate in and successfully
                        complete all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as
                        Appendix "B", including all of the following professional education
                        (the "Professional Education"):
                  
                        (i)   Review and prepare written summaries of each of the
                              following:
                  
                              1.    College Policy #4-12: Medical Records; and
                  
                              2.    College Publication: The Practice Guide: Medical
                                    Professionalism and College Policies;
                  
                        (ii)  individualized instruction in communications satisfactory to
                              the College, with an instructor acceptable to the College,
                              with whom I will make contact within one month of the
                              Effective Date; and
                  
                        (iii) any additional professional education recommended by my
                              Clinical Supervisor(s).
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Romatowski, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of the Professional Education, within one (1)
                        month of completing it. I acknowledge that the College will
                        determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have successfully
                        completed the Professional Education.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Romatowski, acknowledge that a report or reports may be
                        provided to the College regarding my progress and compliance with
                        the Professional Education.
                  
            (9)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Romatowski, undertake that, approximately six (6) months
                        after the Clinical Supervision is completed, I will submit to a
                        reassessment of my practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or
                        assessors selected by the College (the "Assessor(s)").  
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Romatowski, acknowledge that the Reassessment may include a
                        chart review, direct observation of my care, interviews of me,
                        interviews with colleagues and co-workers, feedback from patients
                        and any other tools deemed necessary by the College.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Romatowski, undertake to co-operate fully with the
                        Reassessment, conducted under the term of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Romatowski, acknowledge that my Clinical Supervisor(s) may
                        receive and review the findings of the Assessor(s), and may discuss
                        with the Assessor(s) any issues or concerns arising from the
                        Reassessment.  
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Romatowski, acknowledge that the results of the Reassessment
                        will be provided to me and reported to the College and the report
                        may form the basis of further action by the College. 
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Romatowski, acknowledge that if I am of the view that any of
                        the Assessor(s)'s recommendations are unreasonable, I will have
                        thirty (30) days following my receipt of the recommendations within
                        which to provide the College with my submissions in this regard.  I
                        further acknowledge that thereafter, the ICR Committee will
                        consider my submissions and make a determination regarding whether
                        or not the recommendations, or any of them, are reasonable and if
                        so, whether they, or any of them, constitute limitations or
                        restrictions on my practice, and that decision will be provided to
                        me. 
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Romatowski, undertake that, following the decision
                        referenced in section (9)(f) above, I will abide by those
                        recommendations of the Assessor(s) that the ICR Committee has
                        determined are reasonable. 
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. Romatowski, hereby consent to the following being included
                        on the public register as terms, conditions or limitations on my
                        certificate of registration, for the purposes of section 23 of the
                        Code: 
                  
                        (i)   any recommendations of the Assessor(s) which the ICR
                              Committee has identified in its decision referenced in
                              section (9)(f) as terms, conditions or limitations on my
                              practice.
                  
            (10)  Report by the Chief of Staff

                  (a)   I, Dr. Romatowski, undertake to ensure that the Chief of Staff of
                        Niagara Health System submits a report to the College ("the NHS
                        Report") approximately six (6) months after the Clinical
                        Supervision is completed. The NHS Report shall address my progress
                        pursuant to this Undertaking and disclose any concerns about my
                        communication, including concerns raised by staff and colleagues. 
                  
            (11)  Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Romatowski, undertake to inform the College of each and
                        every location that I practise or have privileges, including, but
                        not limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within five
                        (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further
                        undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that
                        location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Romatowski, undertake that I will submit to, and not
                        interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s)
                        and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Romatowski, give my irrevocable consent to the College to
                        make appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or
                        institution that may have relevant information, in order for the
                        College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this
                        Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Romatowski, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP
                        consent forms, attached hereto as Appendix "C". 
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (12)  I, Dr. Romatowski, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or
                  referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (13)  I, Dr. Romatowski, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. 

            (14)  I, Dr. Romatowski, acknowledge that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (15)  I, Dr. Romatowski, acknowledge that the College will provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (16)  I, Dr. Romatowski, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of
                  this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee.

            (17)  I, Dr. Romatowski, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 
            (18)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Romatowski, acknowledge that, during the time period that
                        this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be
                        posted on the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Romatowski, acknowledge that, in addition to this
                        Undertaking being posted in accordance with section (18)(a) above,
                        the following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during
                        the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr.
                              Romatowski engaged in professional misconduct and/or is
                              incompetent in the practice
                              of gastroenterology, including the management of patients
                              undergoing ERCP. As a result of the investigation:
                  
                                    "Dr. Romatowski will not perform any procedures in
                                    which a patient is sedated to a Ramsey Sedation Scale
                                    (RSS) of 4-6 and/or administered Propofol unless an
                                    Anesthesiologist is present.
                  
                                    "Dr. Romatowski will, during all other procedures where
                                    his patient is sedated, have a qualified regulated
                                    health professional present in the room whose primary
                                    responsibility it is to monitor the patient's airway.
                  
                                    "Dr. Romatowski will practise under the guidance of a
                                    Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for a
                                    minimum of 6 months. 
                  
                                    "Dr. Romatowski will engage in professional education
                                    in communications, medical record keeping, and medical 
                                    professionalism and College policies.
                  
                                    "Dr. Romatowski's practice will be reassessed by an
                                    assessor selected by the College within 6 months of the
                                    end of the period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (19)  I, Dr. Romatowski, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide
                  the following information to any person who requires this information for
                  the purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education
                  and to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice;
                         and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (20)  I, Dr. Romatowski, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide
                  all Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to
                  the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any
                  information arising from the monitoring of my 
                  compliance with this Undertaking.
                  
            (21)  I, Dr. Romatowski, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who
                  facilitate my completion of the Professional Education, and to all
                  Clinical Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to disclose to the
                  College, and to one another, any information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking
                        set out at Appendix "A" to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (c)   relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (d)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking; and/or  
                  
                  (e)   which comes to their attention in the course of providing the
                        Professional Education and which they reasonably believes indicates
                        a potential risk of harm to my patients.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: January 17, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Walter William Romatowski to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective January 17, 2018:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Romatowski engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in the practice of gastroenterology, including the management of patients undergoing ERCP. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Romatowski will not perform any procedures in which a patient is sedated to a Ramsey Sedation Scale (RSS) of 4-6 and/or administered Propofol unless an Anesthesiologist is present.

Dr. Romatowski will, during all other procedures where his patient is sedated, have a qualified regulated health professional present in the room whose primary responsibility it is to monitor the patient’s airway.

Dr. Romatowski will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for a minimum of 6 months.

Dr. Romatowski will engage in professional education in communications, medical record keeping, and medical professionalism and College policies.

Dr. Romatowski’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within 6 months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.


Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: January 17, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)