Rosati, Domenic (CPSO#: 56867)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Aug 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1221 Limeridge Road East
Unit 7
Hamilton ON  L8W 1Y1
Phone: (905) 574-9474
Fax: (905) 574-7435
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Unit 100
360 King Street East
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Y2
Canada
Phone: (905) 574-9474
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Unit 800
723 Rymal Road
Hamilton ON  L9B 2W1
Canada
Phone: (905) 574-9474
Fax: (905) 574-7435
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Domenic Rosati Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 10 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Rosati ( CPSO# 56867 )

Business Address:
Unit 800
723 Rymal Road West
Hamilton ON  L9B 2W2
Phone Number: (905) 385-9287

Business Address:
Unit 7
1221 Limeridge Road East
Hamilton ON  L8W 1Y1
Phone Number: (905) 574-9474

Business Address:
Unit 100
350 King Street East
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Y3
Phone Number: (905) 527-2017

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 May 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DOMENIC ROSATI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSATI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Other - Rotating Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1990