Rosen, Harold David (CPSO#: 62489)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Sep 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Sep 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ont
Department Of Anesthesia
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 2431
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. H. David Rosen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 30 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Rosen ( CPSO# 62489 )

Business Address:
Department of Anaesthesia
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Massachusetts

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 31 Dec 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HAROLD DAVID ROSEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSEN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1990 to 17 Jun 1991
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2001 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 Dec 2001
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Critical Care

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2004