Rosenberg, Erin Alexandra (CPSO#: 87184)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
501 Smyth Road
PO Box 207
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8701
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: E. Rosenberg Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 02 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Rosenberg ( CPSO# 87184 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
Department of Emergency Medicine
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 737-5555

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital - General Campus
Department of Internal Medicine
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8899

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 24 Sep 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ERIN ALEXANDRA ROSENBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSENBERG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2012