Rosenblum, Jerry Howard (CPSO#: 30839)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jun 1979

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 1979

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
P O Box 22043
Westmount Postal Outlet
Waterloo ON  N2L 6J7
Phone: (519) 744-7361
Fax: (519) 744-7363
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jerry Rosenblum Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 04 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Rosenblum ( CPSO# 30839 )

Business Address:
P.O Box 22043
Westmount Postal Outlet
Waterloo ON  N2L 6J7
Phone Number: (519) 744-7361

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 20 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JERRY HOWARD ROSENBLUM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSENBLUM is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 23 Jun 1978 to 22 Jun 1979
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1978
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Jun 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1979