Rosenhek, Israel Shoel (CPSO#: 53522)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Nov 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 14 Oct 2008

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rosenhek Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 28 2008


Corporation Name: Rosenhek Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 04 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Rosenhek ( CPSO# 53522 )

Business Address:
Suite B04
4779 Steeles Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1V 4S5
Phone Number: (416) 298-4956

Hospital Privileges

No Privileges reported.

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  March 11, 2009
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
NOTICE OF REVOCATION OF PRIVILEGES:

On June 2, 2009, Windsor Regional Hospital notified the College that Dr. Israel Shoel Rosenhek's privileges were revoked, effective March 11, 2009.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiology Effective: 07 Dec 1983 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Oct 2008
Terms and conditions amended Effective: 08 Nov 2010
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 06 Dec 2010
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 03 Jan 2011
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 11 Oct 2017
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 12 Oct 2017
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 12 Nov 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 11 Oct 2017 Active View Details [+]


            (1 of 2)
            As from October 11, 2017, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Israel Shoel
            Rosenhek, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Rosenhek
            to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                               UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
                                            ("Undertaking")
                                                  of
                                       DR. ISRAEL SHOEL ROSENHEK
                                           ("Dr. Rosenhek")
                                                  to
                             COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                            (the "College")


                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "Discipline Committee" means the Discipline Committee of the College;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Rosenhek, certificate of registration number 53522, am a member of
                  the College.  The College has received information regarding my standard
                  of practice.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (3)   I, Dr. Rosenhek, undertake to abide by the provisions of this
                  Undertaking, effective October 11, 2017.

            (4)   Practice Restriction

                  (a)   I, Dr. Rosenhek, undertake that I will see a maximum of three (3)
                        patients per hour.
                  
            (5)   Patient Encounter Log

                  (a)   I, Dr. Rosenhek, shall keep one log of all patient encounters, in
                        the form set out at Schedule "A", which will include at least the
                        following information: 
                  
                        (i)   the date of the patient encounter;
                        (ii)  the name of the patient with chart / file number;
                        (iii) the start time of the patient encounter;
                  
                        (iv)  the end time of the patient encounter; and
                        (v)   my initials.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Rosenhek, undertake and agree to keep one single log of
                        patient encounters, regardless of the number of my Practice
                        Location(s) (defined below).
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Rosenhek, undertake and agree to submit the original log of
                        patient encounters to the College on a monthly basis.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Rosenhek, undertake and agree to maintain my own copy of the
                        log of patient encounters at all times, and to make it available to
                        the College upon request.
                  
            (6)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Rosenhek, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location where I practice including, but not limited to clinic(s)
                        and office(s) in any jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice
                        Location(s)"), within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking.
                        Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of any and
                        all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing
                        practice at that location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Rosenhek, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere
                        with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient
                        charts by a College representative solely for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Rosenhek, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP, and/or any person who or institution
                        that may have relevant information, in order for the College to
                        monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Rosenhek, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent
                        form, attached hereto as Appendix "B".
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (7)   I, Dr. Rosenhek, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred
                  to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (8)   I, Dr. Rosenhek, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. 

            (9)   I, Dr. Rosenhek, acknowledge that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (10)  I, Dr. Rosenhek, acknowledge that the College will provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").
            (11)  I, Dr. Rosenhek, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee.

            (12)  I, Dr. Rosenhek, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (13)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Rosenhek, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Rosenhek, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (14)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              Dr. Rosenhek must not see more than a maximum of three
                              patients per hour.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (14)  I, Dr. Rosenhek, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide
                  all Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to
                  the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any
                  information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this
                  Undertaking.

            (2 of 2)
            As from 11:59 p.m., November 8, 2010, by order of the Discipline Committee of
            the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the following terms,
            conditions and limitations are imposed on the certificate of registration held
            by Dr. Israel Shoel Rosenhek:

                  a.    Dr. Rosenhek shall practise solely in an office setting and shall
                        not engage in any hospital-based practice.  Dr. Rosenhek may bring
                        a motion before a panel of the Discipline Committee to vary this
                        condition, bu not earlier than nine (9) months  after the date of
                        this Order;
                  
                  b.    At his own expense, Dr. Rosenhek shall engage in a program of
                        continuing medical education in cardiology that fulfills all of the
                        Maintenance of Certification requirements of the Royal College of
                        Physicians and Surgeons and shall maintain a record of such
                        activities to be produced to the College upon request; 
                  
                  c.    At his own expense, Dr. Rosenhek shall successfully complete,
                        within approximately 18 months, the following education programs:
                  
                              i.    the College's Medical Record-Keeping for Physicians
                                    course, including the follow-up component; and 
                  
                              ii.   an education program in communications acceptable to
                                    the College, 
                  
                        and shall provide proof to the College of his successful completion
                        thereof.
                  
                  d.    Dr. Rosenhek shall practise only under the supervision of a
                        clinical supervisor retained at his own expense and approved by the
                        College who has signed an undertaking in the form attached as
                        Schedule A, and will abide at his own expense by all
                        recommendations of his supervisor with respect to his practice,
                        including with respect to any practice improvements and/or ongoing
                        professional development and/or education.
                  
                  e.    If, at any time after 24 months have passed since the commencement
                        of the clinical supervision of his practice set out at paragraph
                        (d) above, Dr. Rosenhek's clinical supervisor is of the opinion
                        that Dr. Rosenhek is ready to practice without clinical supervison,
                        such clinical supervision shall be discontinued only upon:
                  
                              i.    an assessment of Dr. Rosenhek's practice, undertaken by
                                    a College-appointed assessor at Dr. Rosenhek's expense,
                                    the results of which are satisfactory to the College;
                                    and 
                  
                              ii.   the approval of the College.
                  
                  f.    In any 24-hour period, Dr. Rosenhek will see no more than the lower
                        of (i) 30 patients, and (ii) the number of patients determined by
                        his clinical supervisor.

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 11 Oct 2017
Summary:

On October 11, 2017, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Rosenhek committed an act of 
professional misconduct in that has engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of 
medicine that, having regard to all of the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as 
unprofessional by practicing medicine without clinical supervision, in breach a 2010 Order of the 
Discipline Committee and contrary to the terms, conditions, and limitations on his certificate of 
registration. 
 
Dr. Rosenhek is a cardiologist with a practice in Toronto, Ontario. Prior to 2016, he also had a practice 
in Windsor, Ontario.  
 
2010 Discipline Committee Order 
 
On November 8, 2010, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Rosenhek had committed an act of 
professional misconduct in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in 
cardiology between 2005 and 2007 in his care of multiple patients by:  
   -  failing to appropriately manage cardiac risk factors, such as dyslipidemia, and to prescribe 
      appropriate therapy to reduce such risk; 
   -  failing to perform indicated investigations; 
   -  failing to diagnose medical conditions appropriately and in a sufficiently timely manner; 
   -  failing to appropriately monitor and/or ensure monitoring of complications of medications; 
   -  failing to monitor and act upon test results in an appropriate and sufficiently timely manner; 
   -  failing to engage in appropriate discharge planning for patients in the hospital, including failing 
      to make appropriate and necessary arrangements for care and follow-up; and/or 
   -  failing to maintain legible and sufficiently detailed records of his care and treatment of patients. 
 
The Discipline Committee ordered that the Registrar impose the following terms, conditions and 
limitations on Dr. Rosenhek’s certificate of registration for an indefinite period of time: 
   -  Dr. Rosenhek shall practise only under the supervision of a Clinical Supervisor retained at his 
      own expense and approved by the College, and will abide at his own expense by all 
      recommendations of his supervisor with respect to his practice, including with respect to any 
      practice improvements and/or ongoing professional development and/or education; 
   -  If, at any time after 24 months have passed since the commencement of the clinical supervision 
      of his practice, Dr. Rosenhek’s clinical supervisor is of the opinion that Dr. Rosenhek is ready 
      to practice without clinical supervision, such clinical supervision shall be discontinued only 
      upon: 
          -  an assessment of Dr. Rosenhek’s practice, undertaken by a College-appointed assessor 
             at Dr. Rosenhek’s expense, the results of which are satisfactory to the College; and 
          -  the approval of the College [emphasis add. 
 
Terms of Clinical Supervision  
 
As a result of the November 8, 2010 Discipline Committee Order, Dr. Rosenhek engaged a Clinical 
Supervisor, who undertook to act as Clinical Supervisor for Dr. Rosenhek, for the duration of at least 
24 months. After 3 months of clinical supervision, the level of supervision could be varied at Clinical 
Supervisor’ discretion and with the approval of the College, provided that clinical supervision 
continued for at least 24 months in total. The Clinical Supervisor agreed to submit a written report to 
the College on a monthly basis for the duration of the clinical supervision. 
 
The Clinical Supervisor further agreed that at any time after 24 months, if he is of the opinion that Dr. 
Rosenhek is ready to practise without clinical supervision, he shall advise the College of this so that 
the College may arrange for a practice reassessment to be conducted by an assessor of its choice. In 
such a case, the clinical supervision was not to terminate unless and until:  (a) the College receives, 
evaluates, and is satisfied by the results of the practice reassessment; and (b) the College provides its 
approval for the termination of clinical supervision of Dr. Rosenhek’s practice. 
 
Clinical Supervision and Breach of the 2010 Discipline Committee Order 
 
The Clinical Supervisor provided the College with supervision reports during the period from January 
14, 2011 to August 15, 2014. 
 
On May 16, 2011, the Clinical Supervisor recommended that the number of patient charts reviewed 
per week be reduced from 10 to 5. The College agreed to this change on May 31, 2011. This was the 
only variation of the terms of Dr. Rosenhek’s clinical supervision for which permission was sought 
from the College, and the only variation approved by the College. 
 
On December 8, 2011 and on June 20, 2012 the College advised the Clinical Supervisor that his 
reports did not contain enough information to determine whether Dr. Rosenhek was practising within 
the standard of practice, and requested that his future reports contain more fulsome information. 
 
On September 6, 2012, the Clinical Supervisor reported that Dr. Rosenhek has made tremendous 
improvements in his practice and that he is at the point to practise without clinical supervision. The 
College responded on October 15, 2012, indicating that pursuant to the Discipline Committee Order, 
the 24-month period of clinical supervision is calculated from the time the supervision commences, 
and, therefore, the earliest date on which Dr. Rosenhek’s supervision could potentially end is on a date 
after November 2012. 
 
On January 10 and April 11, 2013 respectively, the Clinical Supervisor reported that in his opinion the 
chart reviews could be eliminated and that he believes that it would be appropriate to end this ongoing 
review.  
 
The College responded on June 13, 2013, indicating that pursuant to the Discipline Committee Order, 
the clinical supervision must continue until Dr. Rosenhek undergoes reassessment by the College and 
the discontinuation of the supervision is approved by the College following a review of the assessor’s 
report. The College informed the Clinical Supervisor that the review was being arranged and that it 
could take six months to complete, during which time he was to provide supervision of Dr. Rosenhek’s 
practice, until the College approves discontinuation of supervision.  
 
The College was in correspondence with Dr. Rosenhek from July 2013 to March 2014 in an attempt to 
schedule practice reassessment. Dr. Rosenhek’s practice reassessment proceeded in March 2014.  
 
On April 9, 2014 and on April 11, 2014, the Clinical Supervisor reported to the College that he has 
provided clinical supervision of Dr. Rosenhek’s practice since November 2010, and that it was his 
understanding that the supervision would last for 24 months, until November 2013. He indicated that 
he had no concerns with Dr. Rosenhek’s practice, that there is no further value in continuing to do 
reviews of Dr. Rosenhek’s records, and that he believes that he had completed his initial agreement 
with the College.  
 
On April 9, 2014, the College wrote to the clinical supervisor, indicating that Dr. Rosenhek is expected 
to practise under supervision until his practice reassessment is completed, that Dr. Rosenhek is 
currently in the process of submitting the information required for the reassessment and to continue to 
provide supervision as per his undertaking until the reassessment is completed and the College 
communicates approval of its discontinuation. On July 30, 2014, the College wrote to the Clinical 
Supervisor to provide him with templates for his future reports and requesting that he completed and 
submitted the reports each month.  
 
The Clinical Supervisor’s last supervision report dated July 16, 2014 was received by the College on 
August 15, 2014.  On August 25, 2014, the College wrote to the Clinical Supervisor requesting him to 
submit the August 2014 report, but no response was received .  
 
Following the College’s inquiry during the practice reassessment as to whether Dr. Rosenhek’s 
practice is still under the clinical supervision as per the 2010 Discipline Committee’s Order, Dr. 
Rosenhek’s counsel informed the College on October 8, 2015 that the Clinical Supervisor had not 
received the College’s letter of August 25, 2014 and that the Supervisor was of the understanding that 
no further reports were required of him, and that he advised Dr. Rosenhek that ongoing supervision 
was not required as he had fulfilled his undertaking. Dr. Rosenhek’s counsel further indicated that the 
Clinical Supervisor now recognizes that he wrongly interpreted his obligations under his undertaking 
and that he regrets his error.  
 
On October 3, 2017, Dr. Rosenhek advised the College that following the College’s letter of 
September 15, 2015, he has sent copies of his patient charts to the Clinical Supervisor for the period 
from August 2014 to August 2015, and that he continued to periodically provide his records from 
September 2015 until approximately March 2016.  
 
After July 2014, Dr. Rosenhek continued to practise medicine without supervision, in breach of the 
requirements in the 2010 Discipline Committee Order; he did not meet and did not follow-up with the 
Clinical Supervisor to determine if he was reviewing the patient charts that he resumed sending to the 
Supervisor after September 2015.  
 
The College did not advise either the Clinical Supervisor or Dr. Rosenhek that supervision was no 
longer required. The College repeatedly advised the Clinical Supervisor that his clinical supervision of 
Dr. Rosenhek was to continue until he was advised by the College that it approved of the 
discontinuation of supervision. The College never approved the discontinuation of Dr. Rosenhek’s 
supervision. Dr. Rosenhek did not attempt to confirm with the College whether his apparent 
understanding, or the Clinical Supervisor’s apparent advice, that supervision was no longer required, 
were correct. Similarly, at no time did Dr. Rosenhek bring a motion to vary the terms of the 2010 
Discipline Committee Order to permit him to return to unsupervised practice. 
 
Prior Dispositions by the Complaints Committee 
 
In November 2003, the Complaints Committee of the College required Dr. Rosenhek to attend at the 
College to be cautioned when aspects of his practice, and his response to a College complaint, were 
found to be concerning. Dr. Rosenhek was cautioned with regard to, among other things, the 
intemperate nature of his response to the patient complaint, the “threatening and intimidating tone” of 
which the Committee found to be “unnecessarily belligerent in the extreme”.   
 
In June 2004, the Complaints Committee of the College required Dr. Rosenhek to attend at the College 
to be cautioned regarding his professional communications.   
 
In October 2006, the Complaints Committee of the College cautioned Dr. Rosenhek regarding his 
communications with patients and the importance of maintaining a professional and courteous 
demeanour.   
 
In December 2008, the Complaints Committee of the College required Dr. Rosenhek to attend at the 
College to be cautioned regarding his professional attitude and demeanour in interacting with a patient, 
and the importance of understanding the fundamental nature of positive and effective communications 
with patients.   
 
2013 Discipline Committee decision 
 
On October 21, 2013, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Rosenhek had engaged in an act or 
omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would 
reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional for: 
 
   -  falsely representing himself as a member of the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of 
      Canada and using the “FRCP(C)” designation when in fact he was not in good standing with 
      the Royal College because of his failure to pay fees and his failure to report his continuing 
      medical education hours pursuant to the Royal College’s Maintenance of Competence 
      (“MOC”) program, between December 1986 when was removed from the register of Fellows in 
      good standing with the Royal College because of his failure to pay annual dues and November 
      2008 when he paid his dues; and 
   -  providing incomplete and inaccurate information to the Windsor Regional Hospital (where he 
      held privileges) as part of its credentialing/re-appointment process regarding his compliance 
      with a program of continuing medical education between 2006 and 2008.  
 
As a result, Dr. Rosenhek was required to appear before the panel to be reprimanded, and to pay costs 
to the College. 
 
March 23, 2016 Undertaking in lieu of s. 37 Order 
 
On March 23, 2016 and on July 21, 2016 Dr. Rosenhek entered into interim undertakings with the 
College, which remained in effect until the date the Discipline Committee disposed of his discipline 
case. 
 
Dr. Rosenhek undertook, among other things, to limit his practice to an initial maximum of the 
equivalent of two days per month, which limit was later raised to three days per month. He also agreed 
to practice under the supervision of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College, who was required 
to meet with Dr. Rosenhek once per month to review at least ten patient charts from the equivalent of 
each full day of patient care provided by Dr. Rosenhek, and to submit written reports to the College at 
least once every two months. 
 
As a result of the interim undertakings, Dr. Rosenhek practised under the supervision of a different 
Clinical Supervisor, beginning March 23, 2016. In early 2017, the new Clinical Supervisor advised 
that he would be discontinuing his supervision of Dr. Rosenhek’s practice as of April 30, 2017.  Dr. 
Rosenhek was not able to locate a replacement supervisor. Dr. Rosenhek has not practiced medicine 
since May 1, 2017. 
 
No concerns regarding Dr. Rosenhek’s compliance with the interim undertakings have been identified 
by either the Clinical Supervisor or the College’s compliance monitor. 
 
October 11, 2017 Undertaking  
 
Dr. Rosenhek has entered into an undertaking with the College, dated October 11, 2017, by which he 
has agreed, among other things, that he shall see a maximum of three patients per hour. 
 
On October 11, 2017, the Committee ordered and directed that: 
 
-  Registrar suspend Dr. Rosenhek’s certificate of registration for a period of one (1) month 
   commencing on October 12, 2017. 
-  Dr. Rosenhek appear before the panel to be reprimanded. 
-  Dr. Rosenhek pay costs to the College for a one day hearing in the amount of $5,500.00 within 30 
   days of the date of this Order. 
-  the results of this proceeding be included in the register.

Hearing Date(s): October 11, 2017


Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 06 Aug 2013
Summary:

On August 6, 2013, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Israel Shoel Rosenhek committed 
an act of professional misconduct, in that he has engaged in conduct or an act or omission 
relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would 
reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. Dr. 
Rosenhek did not contest the allegation.  
 
Dr. Rosenhek was certified as a specialist in cardiology and internal medicine by the Royal 
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada effective December 7, 1983 and June 12, 1984, 
respectively. He continues to hold these qualifications. In January 1984, Dr. Rosenhek became a 
Fellow of the Royal College. This entitled him to use the designation of "FRCP(C)". Effective 
December 1, 1986, Dr. Rosenhek was removed from the register of Fellows because of his failure 
to pay annual dues.  As a result, he was not entitled to use the designation FRCP(C). He was not 
reinstated as a Fellow until November 5, 2008 when the dues were paid. From 1986 to 2008, Dr. 
Rosenhek routinely represented himself as a Fellow of the Royal College by using the 
designation FRCP(C) in his professional communications with hospital administration, patients, 
physician colleagues and the public. 
 
Dr. Rosenhek held privileges at Hospital A in 2006 and was bound by the hospital's 
credentialing/re-appointment process, including a policy requiring department members applying 
for reappointment to either submit certificates demonstrating their compliance with the Royal 
College's Maintenance of Competence Program ("MOC program") or documentation of adequate 
attendance at a major Continuing Medical Education ("CME") event related to the specialists' 
field of practice. On Dr. Rosenhek's application for reappointment for 2007/2008, he indicated 
that he was a member of the Royal College and was fulfilling the requirement of the MOC 
program. He did not provide a certificate demonstrating his compliance with the program or any 
documentation of his CME for the relevant time period.   
 
On July 13, 2007, the Chief of the Department of Medicine of Hospital A wrote to Dr. Rosenhek 
notifying him that his application was incomplete, as it failed to include proof his continuing 
medical education.  He asked that Dr. Rosenhek submit this information on or before July 31, 
2007. Dr. Rosenhek did not provide any additional information to the hospital in connection with 
his application for re-appointment in 2007-2008.  
 
Dr. Rosenhek submitted another application for re-appointment to the professional staff of 
Hospital A for the 2008-2009 year. He failed to check "yes" or "no" to the questions regarding 
whether he was a member of the Royal College and whether he was fulfilling the requirements of 
the MOC program. He also failed to provide a certificate demonstrating his compliance with the 
MOC program or provide proof of his CME. Dr. X wrote to Dr. Rosenhek on March 3 and June 
3, 2008, to advise that his application was incomplete for these reasons and asked him to 
complete his application and submit it by June 17, 2008. On August 21 and 25, 2008, Dr. 
Rosenhek wrote to Dr. X providing certificates indicating he had attended CME programs. 
 
The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that Dr. Rosenhek attend before the panel to be 
reprimanded and pay costs to the College in the amount of $15,000 within thirty (30) days of the 
date of this Order. 
              

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): August 6, 2013


Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 08 Nov 2010
Summary:

On November 8, 2010, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Rosenhek committed acts of 
professional misconduct in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession of 
cardiology between 2005 and 2007 in his care of multiple patients (including by failing to 
diagnose medical conditions appropriately and in a sufficiently timely manner, by failing to 
appropriately manage cardiac risk factors, by failing to appropriately monitor complications of 
medications, and other enumerated failures). 
 
The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that: 
 
1.    The Registrar suspend Dr. Rosenhek's certificate of registration for a period of four (4) 
      weeks commencing on December 6, 2010; 
 
2.    Dr. Rosenhek attend before the panel to be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to 
      be recorded on the register; 
 
3.    The Registrar impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Rosenhek's 
      certificate of registration for an indefinite period of time: 
 
      a.    Dr. Rosenhek shall practise solely in an office setting and shall not engage in any 
            hospital-based practice.  Dr. Rosenhek may bring a motion before a panel of the 
            Discipline Committee to vary this condition, but not earlier than nine (9) months 
            after the date of this Order; 
 
      b.    At his own expense, Dr. Rosenhek shall engage in a program of continuing 
            medical education in cardiology that fulfills all of the Maintenance of 
            Certification requirements of the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons and 
            shall maintain a record of such activities to be produced to the College upon 
            request; 
 
      c.    At his own expense, Dr. Rosenhek shall successfully complete, within 
            approximately 18 months, the following education programs: 
 
            i.    the College's Medical Record-Keeping for Physicians course, including the 
                  follow-up component; and 
            ii.   an education program in communications acceptable to the College, 
 
      and shall provide proof to the College of his successful completion thereof. 
 
      d.    Dr. Rosenhek shall practise only under the supervision of a clinical supervisor 
            retained at his own expense and approved by the College, who has signed an 
            undertaking in the form attached as Schedule A, and will abide at his own expense 
            by all recommendations of his supervisor with respect to his practice, including 
            with respect to any practice improvements and/or ongoing professional 
            development and/or education; 
 
 
 
 
       
      e.    If, at any time after 24 months have passed since the commencement of the 
            clinical supervision of his practice set out at paragraph 4(d) above, Dr. Rosenhek's 
            clinical supervisor is of the opinion that Dr. Rosenhek is ready to practice without 
            clinical supervision, such clinical supervision shall be discontinued only upon: 
 
            i.    an assessment of Dr. Rosenhek's practice, undertaken by a 
                  College-appointed assessor at Dr. Rosenhek's expense, the results of which 
                  are satisfactory to the College; and 
            ii.   the approval of the College. 
 
      f.    In any 24-hour period, Dr. Rosenhek will see no more than the lower of (i) 30 
            patients, and (ii) the number of patients determined by his clinical supervisor.   
 
4.    Dr. Rosenhek shall within 30 days pay the College its costs of this proceeding in the 
      amount of $10,000.00. 

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): November 8, 2010

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: October 11, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Israel Shoel Rosenhek to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective October 11, 2017:

Dr. Rosenhek must not see more than a maximum of three patients per hour.


Source: Member
Active Date: July 21, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Israel Shoel Rosenhek to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective July 21, 2016:

Dr. Rosenhek is the subject of a referral to the Discipline Committee into allegations that he is incompetent and/or failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in his care of patients and that he engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct by failing to abide by the terms, conditions and limitations imposed on his certificate of registration by the Discipline Committee on approximately November 8, 2010. As a result of the referral:

Dr. Rosenhek must limit his practice to a maximum of three (3) days per month and practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College; and Dr. Rosenhek can practise only at 4779 Steeles Avenue.

Note: Effective May 6, 2017, Dr. Rosenhek has ceased practising medicine. Dr. Rosenhek did not meet the requirement in his undertaking to obtain a supervisor acceptable to the College. Therefore, in accordance with the terms of his undertaking Dr. Rosenhek has ceased practising medicine.