Ross, Catherine Ann (CPSO#: 59680)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Juravinski Hospital
Department Of Pathology
Room 204
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone: (905) 527-4322 Ext. 42726
Fax: (905) 575-2553
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Foley & Ross Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 24 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Ross ( CPSO# 59680 )
Dr. S. Foley ( CPSO# 59834 )

Business Address:
Hamilton Health Services
Henderson Site
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 389-4411

Business Address:
699 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2
Phone Number: (905) 389-4411

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 03 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CATHERINE ANN ROSS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Sep 1997
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1989