Ross, Joan Elizabeth (CPSO#: 60372)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Oct 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Oct 1988

Summary

Former Name: Bennett, Joan Elizabeth (used until: 04 Jun 1990 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1098 London Rd
Sarnia ON  N7S1P1
Phone: (519) 337-9999
Fax: (519) 541-0873
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Ross Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 12 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Ross ( CPSO# 60372 )

Business Address:
1098 London Road
Sarnia ON  N7S 1P1
Phone Number: (519) 337-9999

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bluewater Health Sarnia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 08 Nov 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOAN ELIZABETH ROSS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Oct 1988